open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-03175
    Party Name:Jones (ID 48782) v. Parks et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Filing Fee Paid]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?128282
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =