open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02691
    Party Name:Bowers v. Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Place of Trial]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [AO Form 121 Report on Filing or Determination Re: a Copyright]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129252
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =