open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-22393
    Party Name:Clarke David Ishmael Hunter and Jennifer Marie Ishmael Hunter
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Service]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Schedule J]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Schedule I]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Schedule C]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Correct Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:November 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?259397
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =