open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:6:19-cv-01298
    Party Name:Johnston v. SDI Ellsworth, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Joint Mediation Notice]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129254
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =