open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-03245
    Party Name:Clay (ID 102093) v. Hydro et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend Complaint]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibits]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Discovery]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [SEALED Exhibits]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Conventionally]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Under Seal]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Conventionally]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129463
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =