open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:20-cv-02032
    Party Name:Great Western Bank v. Pinnacle Regional Hospital, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Paid]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Place of Trial]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?130002
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =