open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:20-cv-04036
    Party Name:Jones v. Atrium Hospitality LP
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Place of Trial]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?131980
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =