open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:20-40649
    Party Name:Darryl Lamar Garcia and Surretha Belle Garcia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?263131
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =