U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plasencio
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment]
  • April 01, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • January 21, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit]
  • January 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 15, 2021: [Arrest]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • January 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.