U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ager
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Return of Service]
  • March 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • January 26, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • January 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.