U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loria-Calvo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • September 01, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • June 04, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • January 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.