U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Case-Lumley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 10, 2021: [Discovery]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.