U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Honora
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • January 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.