U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cm-60001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Revocation Judgment (Transfer Case)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 10, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • November 04, 2021: [Appointment of Counsel]
  • November 04, 2021: [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.