U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meyers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 19, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • April 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • January 13, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 13, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.