U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mattos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • July 27, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • January 15, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.