U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 10, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.