U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • September 13, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 10, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.