U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chrestman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 26, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
  • February 25, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • February 22, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
  • February 21, 2021: [Response (Other)]
  • February 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Stay of Execution]
  • February 19, 2021: [Stay of Execution]
  • February 19, 2021: [Review]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Memorandum of Law]
  • February 16, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.