U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pope
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 05, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
  • March 05, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 04, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 17, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
  • February 17, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.