U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roebuck
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed in Absentia]
  • July 08, 2021: [Proceed in Absentia]
  • July 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 17, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.