U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meeks
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • September 13, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed in Absentia]
  • August 10, 2021: [Proceed in Absentia]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 17, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.