U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • February 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.