U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ricoma-McDonald
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 18, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.