U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franklin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • May 24, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • May 24, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.