U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Discovery]
  • May 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • February 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.