U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Fine Check]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • December 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 18, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.