U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Varghese
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue 18:3161]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.