U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hulse
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • April 12, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • January 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 06, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 18, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.