U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinkley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.