U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit]
  • March 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 08, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • March 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.