U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.