U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Macias
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Revocation Judgment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 14, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arrest]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • May 11, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.