U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.