U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peres
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • July 25, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • April 30, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • April 26, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 19, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Sealed Document-use ONLY with other selection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.