U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mj-06032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • March 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 31, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.