U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kihn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2021: [Arrest]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.