U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-08253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stone
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.