U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.