U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mj-06043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Orozco-Landeros
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • April 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Needed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.