U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cm-60012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elias
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Mandate]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Record on Appeal Sent to 10CCA]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order from 10CCA]
  • April 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 11, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • April 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Appeal Number Info]
  • March 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.