U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-po-06041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Uhlig
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • October 20, 2021: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • August 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.