U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 07, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.