U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pierce
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • May 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 07, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.