U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Story
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • June 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 19, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 19, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.