U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 19, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.