U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 21, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 18, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 19, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.