U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • May 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • May 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2021: [Arrest]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Amended Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.