U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lile
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • October 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed in Absentia]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 09, 2021: [Proceed in Absentia]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 10, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 19, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.