U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ellison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • May 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.